Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thompson, Angela Mari, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Thompson, Steven John, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference Dismissal Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Family Law Status Conference (CRC 5.83) | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 3rd Status Conference Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 2ND Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.