Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Black, Adam, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Brown, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryPetition For Custody And Support Of Minor Children |
Time To Trial172 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mediation Recommendation and Order
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Petitioner's Reques for Order Filed 9/27/2021 for Modification of Visitation; Continued from 9/13/22 for Receipt of Mediation Recommendation Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Partial Agreement with Recommendation of CCRC | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing of 09/13/2022
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Referral to Family Court Services Mediation | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Petitioner's Reques for Order Filed 9/27/2021 for Modification of Visitation; Continued from 1/10/22 for Receipt of Mediation Recommendation Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.