Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oxborough, Debra, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Oxborough, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 26, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions66 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time583 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Thomas E. Baker, Re: #2 QDRO | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance and Response of Employee Benefit Plan Walmart |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of the Notice of Appearance of Employee Benefit Plan and Letter to Superior Court of California served on the Respondent |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of the Notice of Appearance of Employee Benefit Plan and Letter to Superior Court of California served on the Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.