Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Butte County Department Of Child Support Services filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Time To Trial168 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Minutes and Order |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Enforcement of Child Support; Health Care; Judgment; Continuance of trial granted to Defendant from 6/8/18 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order - No Fee Re: Child Support, Vacating Trial Date and Order Thereon Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Trial of Child Support; Health Care; Judgment Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of the Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed 6/5/18 served on the Other Parent |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of the Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed 6/5/18 served on Jessica Jackson |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of the Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed 6/5/18 served on Chad Sallade on behalf of DCSS |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of the Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed 6/5/18 served on Butte County DCSS |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing 6/8/18 to 6/19/18 Judge: Gunn, David E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.