Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Butte County Department Of Child Support Services filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time1063 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Respondent Filed 1-28-2022 Regarding Child Support and Arrears, Continued from 03/08/2022 to Confirm Timeshare with Minor, to be Heard With Related Case DFL023455- 2 hour estimate Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Minutes and Order After Hearing as to the Other Parent | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Respondent Filed 1-28-2022 Regarding Child Support and Arrears Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail of Responsive Declaration to Request for Order as to respondent | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail of Responsive Declaration to Request for Order as to other parent | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Request for Order as to Other Parent | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Request for Order as to Petitioner | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Request for Order as Shelly Ann Powell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.