Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sierra Central Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Smith, Kelly Jean, against Robles, Alfonso, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management114 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions138 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time138 days |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: July 13, 2018Notice of Reassignment
Date: December 27, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: April 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to Butte County Writ of Execution Issued to Butte County |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment - Issued | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Allowing Copies in Lieu of Originals Order Allowing Copies in Lieu of Original Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment By Court
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Attorney Fees Order Allowing Attorney's Fees Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Court Judgment Request for Court Judgment |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Accrued Interest Declaration of Accrued Interest |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.