Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Orchard Hospital Inc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Vierra, Sierra, against Hanna Rhee, Md Inc, Rhee, Hanna, Md, represented by Fenton, Benjamin Joseph, Fleer, John Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time565 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: December 20, 2018Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered
Date: April 19, 2019Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: August 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Status of Settlement and Dismissal Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Order Setting Aside Sanctions Proof of Mailing |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Aside Sanctions Order Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Notice of Entry of Dismissal |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Plaintiff Case Management Conference Re Status of Mediation Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Plaintiff Case Management Statement Plaintiff's Case Management Statement |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling : At defendant's request, the court will continue the case management conference 90 days to April 10, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Case management conference statements are to be timely filed and served. Defendant is to provide notice of this order. Counsel are not required to appear. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.