Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Onemain Financial Group Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Beyer, Christopher Allen, against Newport, Eric David, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Time To Trial228 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Management Conference
Date: April 20, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: July 24, 2018Request
Date: July 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause as to Plaintiff's Counsel Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Order to Show Cause Issued to Christopher Allen Beyer Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing, Order to Show Cause Returned Mail Proof of Mailing, Order to Show Cause |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Order to Show Cause as to Christopher Allen Beyer Proof of Mailing of Order to Show Cause as to Plaintiff's Counsel Christopher Allen Beyer |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause as to Plaintiff's Counsel Order to Show Cause - Court Issued Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduling Status Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee) Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.