Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Heim, Sara, filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time67 days |
Petition for Decree of Change Of Name
Date: December 18, 2017Petition Hearing
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Reassignment
Date: December 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition for Decree of Change Of Name Petition Hearing To Change Name Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name Decree Changing Name |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling The petitioner is directed to appear and the court will hear about any attempts to serve the actual father, if known. |
|
February 23, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
The petitioner is directed to appear and the court will hear about any attempts to serve the actual father, if known.
Judge: Tamara L Mosbarger |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Publication Proof or Affidavit of Publication |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Background Check Results Received | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order To Show Cause for Change of Name Order To Show Cause for Change of Name Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Reassignment
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.