Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pierce, Thomas, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Reiner, Russell Paul, against King, Earl Eugene, Royal Pacific Limousine, represented by Pabros, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Rodney G. Stone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodney G. Stone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 20, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial: Long Cause TE: 8 - 10 days Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Conference: Trial Management | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Conference: Mandatory Settlement
Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial: Long Cause TE: 8 days Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendants In Limine 1-6 & Plaintiffs in Limine 1-7 Judge: Wood, Victoria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.