Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Guillermo, Jabin, Holly, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Shueh, Mayen, represented by Imfeld, Michael David, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Victoria D. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictoria D. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims Appeals |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time56 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Exhibit Letter |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims) | |
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Decision | |
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Under Submission for Decision
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial De Novo
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial De Novo
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Exhibit List (Court) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.