Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lepage, Renee, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against County Of Napa, County Of Napa Sheriff'S Department, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Diane M. Price presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane M. Price Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2017 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
OSC/Status DLR
Judge: Price, Diane |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response or Reply DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Price, Diane |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Removal of Action | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) As to County of Napa Sheriff's Department |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.