Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mcknight, Patricia, Mcknight, Terry, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Wiens, Ranger, against At Medical Transportation, Llc, Ramirez Aguirre, Aleja, Tadevosyan, Nver, represented by Shapazian, Larry H., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Gaab, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaab, Kimberly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial529 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: June 06, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 18, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: March 21, 2019Application Filed
Date: July 09, 2019Order Granted
Date: July 22, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 21, 2020Notice Filed
Date: March 03, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: July 09, 2019Stipulation Filed
Date: July 09, 2019Notice Filed
Date: March 22, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 28, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 17, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 03, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: March 21, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 21, 2019Order Granted
Date: March 21, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: March 20, 2019Stipulation Filed
Date: March 20, 2019ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: April 17, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 16, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: December 15, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Motions: Petitions to Compromise Minors’ Claims (x3) Tentative Ruling: To grant. Orders signed. Hearings off calendar. Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 3.1312(a), and Code of Civil Procedur...
Judge: Kimberly Gaab |
|
August 11, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion: By Petitioner Patricia McKnight to Compromise Disputed Claim of Minor in Pending Action Tentative Ruling: To deny without prejudice. In the event that oral argument is requested, minor is excu...
Judge: Kimberly Gaab |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by both parties; Time est. 5-10 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Received Letter re: Notice of Settlement |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing *department change* |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment from Chambers with Certificate of Mailing |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Settlement of Entire Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.