Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Garcia, Carlos E., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barry, David N, against Ford Motor Company, represented by Dye, Stephen H., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Gaab, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaab, Kimberly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management119 days |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2017 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial574 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time522 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 29, 2018Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: December 14, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Status Review
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by both parties with estimeted time of 3-5 days. Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Status Review
Judge: Diaz, Monica |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
2018-10-30 Garcia-Fords Ntc of Settlm Notice Filed DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY???S NOTICE OF STATUS OF CASE SETTLEMENT |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Continued CRC 3.1385 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.