Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Johnson, Whitney, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2011 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2026 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | *Collections: Completed | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release on Dismissals | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Interpreter Required During Hearing | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Anaya, Robert |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.