Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Smith Carol, filed a(n) case represented by Pro Se, against Smith Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Marina E. Ammendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarina E. Ammendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED
Date: May 25, 2021STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: June 15, 2021EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - CONTINUED
Date: May 25, 2021OP - EXCLUSIVE POSSESSION OF RESIDENCE TO PETITIONER
Date: May 25, 2021SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: June 02, 2021TERMINATE ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED
Date: June 14, 2021ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: May 25, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: May 25, 2021COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: May 25, 2021PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00ELDER PETITION FOR INDEPENDENT PROTECTION ORDER
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: June 29, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.