Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Johnson Wanda, filed a(n) case represented by Pro Se, against Fox Katherine, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Marina E. Ammendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarina E. Ammendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
TERMINATE ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED
Date: July 08, 2021ORDER ON COURTS MOTION - CAUSE DISMISSED
Date: July 08, 2021ORDER OF PROTECTION EX.PARTE - EXTENDED - ALLOWED -
Date: June 17, 2021EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: May 28, 2021SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED - PAID
Date: June 01, 2021ORDER OF PROTECTION EX.PARTE - EXTENDED - ALLOWED -
Date: May 28, 2021ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: June 07, 2021ORDER OF PROTECTION EX.PARTE - EXTENDED - CONTINUED -
Date: June 17, 2021ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - CONTINUED
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00ELDER PETITION FOR INDEPENDENT PROTECTION ORDER
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00OP - EXCLUSIVE POSSESSION OF RESIDENCE TO PETITIONER
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00ORDER OF PROTECTION EX.PARTE - EXTENDED - CONTINUED -
Date: May 28, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED - PAID
Date: May 28, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.