Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jaramillo Martha, filed a(n) case represented by Pro Se, against Jaramillo Oscar, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Marina E. Ammendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarina E. Ammendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
CASE ASSIGNED TO ELMR DIVISION
Date: January 12, 2021DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: February 02, 2021OP - EXCLUSIVE POSSESSION OF RESIDENCE TO PETITIONER
Date: February 02, 2021EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - CONTINUED
Date: January 12, 2021E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: January 12, 2021SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: February 03, 2021SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: January 14, 2021EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED
Date: January 12, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00ELDER PETITION FOR INDEPENDENT PROTECTION ORDER
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00ORDER OF PROTECTION (PLENARY) - ALLOWED
Date: February 02, 2021ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00OP - EXCLUSIVE POSSESSION OF RESIDENCE TO PETITIONER
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: February 02, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.