Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Perez Tyler, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Levan Mary, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Loza, Pamela E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoza, Pamela E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Allocation Of Parental Responsibilities - Cs |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00298 Petition Filed - Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition For Allocation Of Parental Responsibilities - CS
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Action Involves Minor Child/Children
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition For Temp Protection Order
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Parties Have Not Previously Filed For Divorce
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition For Temp Protection Order
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Emergency Order Of Protection - Denied
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Petition For Order Of Protection Continued For Hearing - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Restricted Image
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Restricted Image
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Amended Petition Filed
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Order Of Protection (Plenary) - Allowed
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00OP - Parenting Time - Denied
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Child Representative
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Appoint Atty, Child Rep, Gal, Trustee Or Exec. - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00OP - Physical Possession Of Children To Petitioner
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Submit For Drug/Alcohol Testing Or Assessment - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00DR4801
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Submit For Drug/Alcohol Testing Or Assessment - Allowed
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Order For Supervised Parenting Time - Allowed
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00DR4801
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Amended Petition Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Cause Continued For Hearing (Agreed) - Allowed -
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Non-Parent Awarded Visitation - Allowed
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Motion To - Denied -
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Rule To Show Cause Be Issued - Allowed -
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Cause Continued For Hearing (Agreed) - Allowed -
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Financial Affidavit - Filed
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Answer To Interrogatories Filed
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Cause Continued For Hearing (Agreed) - Allowed -
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Order Arrearage Set (Amount Needed) - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Parenting Plan Prepared By One Party
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Refund - Allowed -
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00DR4801
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Completion Of Minor Children Parenting Education/ Respondent - Filed -
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Order For Installment Payments Of Judgment
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Order Referral For Other Evalution By Private Resource - Allowed
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Finding Of Parentage - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Order Support Payments Made Direct To Respondant - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Confirmation Of Prior Order - Allowed -
Date: April 28, 2023Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: August 15, 2023Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: January 30, 2023Case Set On Progress Call
Date: March 09, 2023Amend Order Or Decree - Allowed -
Date: March 09, 2023Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: August 15, 2023File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: November 22, 2022Order Parenting Time To Petitioner - Allowed -
Date: March 09, 2023Case Set On Progress Call
Date: April 28, 2023Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: July 03, 2023EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - DENIED
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00PETITION FOR TEMP PROTECTION ORDER
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00ACTION INVOLVES MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00298 PETITION FILED - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00PETITION FOR ORDER OF PROTECTION CONTINUED FOR HEARING - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00PETITION FOR ALLOCATION OF PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITIES - CS
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00PETITION FOR TEMP PROTECTION ORDER
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00RESTRICTED IMAGE
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00RESTRICTED IMAGE
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.