Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carolina Espinoza, Espinoza Carolina, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by , Chicago Il, 60602, 28 N Clark St, States Atty Child Support, against Jordan Reed, Reed Jordan, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Administrative Declaration Of Parentage - Dhfs |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Petition Filed
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: June 23, 2022Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: August 11, 2022Order Support Payments Direct To C.C.C./S.D.U. - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00DR4801
Date: June 23, 2022New Case Filing
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Issue Of Medical Support - Reserved -
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Voluntary Acknowledgment Of Paternity - Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Pet For Admin Declaration Of Parentage - Dhfs
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Disburse Monies Or Funds - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Order Support Payments Direct To C.C.C./S.D.U. - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: August 11, 2022Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: June 13, 2022Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: August 11, 2022Order Arrearage Set (Amount Needed) - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: June 13, 2022Case Off Call
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Case Off Call
Date: November 10, 2022Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: August 11, 2022Continuance - Allowed -
Date: June 23, 2022Issue Of Retroactive Support - Reserved
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00VOLUNTARY ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PATERNITY - FILED -
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00PET FOR ADMIN DECLARATION OF PARENTAGE - DHFS
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.