Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Foreman, Courtney, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Heyer, David J, against Markert, Kristin, represented by Meachum Boyle & Trafman, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Moira S. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoira S. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Jury |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Summons Served - Personal Service
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: No Contact
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Order Case Transferred For Trial To Municipal Dept, 1st Dist
Date: October 25, 2021Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Answer Filed
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00298 Petition Defendant/Respondent - Denied
Date: November 02, 2021Answer Filed
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Motion Filed
Date: November 22, 2021E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00298 Petition Filed-Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Waiver -
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Transfer Case To Presiding Judge Within District/Division
Date: October 25, 2021Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Transfer Case To Presiding Judge Within District/Division
Date: October 25, 2021Answer Filed
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00298 Petition Filed-Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Waiver -
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Order Case Transferred For Trial To Municipal Dept, 1st Dist
Date: October 25, 2021Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NO CONTACT
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00ROUTINE MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00298 PETITION FILED-DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - PERSONAL SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE WAIVER -
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.