Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nwogu, Augusta, Nwogu, Jennifer, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Polansky Cichon&Batey Cht, against Sharp, Hewson, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Kathy M. Flanagan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathy M. Flanagan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Non Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Soj (As Of Right) - Allowed
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Jury Demand Filed - Fee Paid
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: March 17, 2023Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Withdraw Or Release Deposits, Exhibits,Documents -Allowed-
Date: March 17, 2023Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Case Rerandomized To Motion Call
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: March 17, 2023Notice Filed
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: March 17, 2023Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Other Reason
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Answer To Petition Filed
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00File Vouchers - Allowed -
Date: March 17, 2023Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Answer To Petition Filed
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: March 17, 2023Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Deposit Monies Or Funds - Allowed -
Date: March 17, 2023Assess Costs - Allowed -
Date: March 17, 2023Strike Or Vacate An Order - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Transfer To Judge Within Division
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Receipt Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Disburse Monies Or Funds - Allowed -
Date: March 17, 2023Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Case Rerandomized To Motion Call
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Transfer To Judge Within Division
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Jury Demand Filed - Fee Paid
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: OTHER REASON
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.