Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Byline Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hinshaw Culbertson, against Cui, Charles, Immigration Attorneys, P., in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Michael F. Otto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael F. Otto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract - Non-Jury |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Dismissed For Want Of Prosecution
Date: March 08, 2022New Case Filing
Date: August 11, 2021Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Contract Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Postcard Generated
Date: November 03, 2021Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: December 09, 2021Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: March 23, 2022Case Set On Individual Calendar
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: December 09, 2021Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: August 19, 2021Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Motion To Vacate, Modify/Reinstate Final Order/Judgment < Or = 30 Days
Date: March 22, 2022CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: August 19, 2021CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.