Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brooks Malissa, Malissa Brooks, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dworkin, Bradley S, against Guerra Teresa, Teresa Guerra, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with James N. O’Hara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames N. O’Hara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Non Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Exhibits Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: November 02, 2021Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: November 02, 2021Voluntary Mediat. Was Not Utilized In Reach. This Settlement
Date: November 02, 2021New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Postcard Generated
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: November 02, 2021Voluntary Mediat. Was Not Utilized In Reach. This Settlement
Date: November 02, 2021Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: November 02, 2021Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00ROUTINE MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.