Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Acosta, Destinee, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Salvato & O'Toole, against Kambridge Restaurant, Inc, Mechanical 24, Inc. D B A, represented by Urgo & Nugent Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with McKenna, Scott D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcKenna, Scott D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury / Wrongful Death - Jury |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Other Personal Injury Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: No Contact
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Motion For Appointment Of Special Process Server Filed
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice To Produce Filed
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Service By Special Order Of Court - Allowed
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Affidavit Of Compliance Filed
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Mailed
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Vacate Any Or All Default Orders - Allowed -
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Comply - Denied -
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Vacate Discovery Closure Date - Allowed
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Strike Or Vacate An Order - Continued -
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Denied -
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Brief Filed
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Vacate Discovery Closure Date - Allowed
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Protective Order - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: July 05, 2023File Counter-Claim Or Cross Complaint - Allowed -
Date: July 31, 2023Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Counter Claim Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: August 15, 2023File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: August 15, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: July 31, 2023Protective Order - Allowed -
Date: July 19, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 25, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: August 15, 2023Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: July 31, 2023Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: July 25, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice To Produce Filed
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Other Personal Injury Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: No Contact
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NO CONTACT
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00ROUTINE MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00OTHER PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.