Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Formanek, Joseph, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Spinuzza, Charles, against Hussein, Saleh, Hussein, Nasser, represented by Burdelik, Mary Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Brendan A. O’Brien presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrendan A. O’Brien Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury(Motor Vehicle) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: March 31, 2022Motion Filed
Date: March 31, 2022Proof Of Service Filed
Date: October 13, 2021Answer Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: November 08, 2021Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: April 07, 2022Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Comply - Allowed -
Date: April 07, 2022Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: October 14, 2021New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: No Contact
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00ROUTINE MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: October 14, 2021ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NO CONTACT
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.