Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Singleton, Andrew, Franklin, Robert, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Malman, Steven James, against Symphony Crestwood, Llc D, represented by Johnson Bell Ltd, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury / Wrongful Dealth - Jury |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Motion Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Motion Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Exhibits Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Answer And Copy Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Postcard Generated
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Subpoena Filed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Other Personal Injury Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00SUBPOENA FILED
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00OTHER PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.