Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Progressive Northern Insu, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Keis George Llp, against Miller, Sheretta, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Melissa A. Durkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelissa A. Durkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Non Jury |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: May 24, 2022Default - Allowed -
Date: May 24, 2022Case Set On Prove Up Call
Date: May 24, 2022Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: January 19, 2022Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: March 23, 2022Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: March 23, 2022Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Moved
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: January 19, 2022Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: March 16, 2022Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: January 19, 2022Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: MOVED
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.