Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Medline Industries Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by The Ckb Firm, against Wholly Wholesale Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Michael F. Otto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael F. Otto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Affidavit In Support Of Motion Filed
Date: December 17, 2021New Case Filing
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Alias Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: November 18, 2021Contract Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: November 18, 2021Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Case Set On Individual Calendar
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: November 18, 2021Electronic Notice Sent
Date: October 15, 2021Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: November 30, 2021Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: November 18, 2021Prove Up Set For - Continued -
Date: November 18, 2021CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.