Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chunwoon, Inc., Dba Sabu, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shim, Sang Won, against Midvale Indemnity Company, represented by Langhenry Gillen Lundquis, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Daniel J. Kubasiak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J. Kubasiak Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Default - Continued -
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Contract Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Case Set On Individual Calendar
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Quash Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Case Removed To Federal Court -
Date: February 28, 2022Quash Writ - Continued -
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Default - Continued -
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Quash Writ - Continued -
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Contract Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.