Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Deprey Brittany, Deprey Madison, Deprey Michael, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by 120 N Lasalle St3100, , Chicago Il, 60602, Clifford Law Offices Pc, against Campos, Rn Rebecca, Doyle, Md Christine, Dupage Medical Group, Edward-Elmhurst Healthcar, Elmhurst Memorial Hospita, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with McKenna, Scott D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcKenna, Scott D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Medical Mal-Practice Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Hipaa Protective Order - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: September 07, 2023Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: September 07, 2023Assess Costs - Allowed -
Date: September 12, 2023Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: September 12, 2023Motion Filed
Date: September 07, 2023Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: September 07, 2023Motion Filed
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Subpoena Filed
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2023-09-07T00:00:00Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Summons Served - Substitute Service
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-09-07T00:00:00Terminate As Respondent In Discovery - Allowed
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Motion To - Denied -
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-09-07T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: September 12, 2023Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: September 12, 2023Disburse Monies Or Funds - Allowed -
Date: September 12, 2023Voluntary Dismissal Specific Defendant W/Leave To Refile-Alw
Date: September 12, 2023Motion Filed
Date: 2023-09-07T00:00:00MEDICAL MAL-PRACTICE COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.