Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sanchez Raul, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by 10 N Dearborn #500, , Ankin Howard H Atty At La, Chicago Il, 60602, against Rosalez Cristina, Wilson Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Non Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Summons Served - Substitute Service
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Not Listed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Service By Special Order Of Court - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: July 21, 2022Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: June 28, 2022Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: July 21, 2022Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: May 26, 2022Proof Of Service Filed
Date: September 02, 2022Notice Of Deposition Filed
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Case Set On Prove Up Call
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Interrogatories Filed
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Request Filed
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: June 21, 2022Motion Filed
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: September 02, 2022Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice To Produce Filed
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.