Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Collins Bella, Collins Ja Shawna, Collins London, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by 10 N Dearborn #500, , Ankin Howard H Atty At La, Chicago Il, 60602, against Lewis Judy, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Non Jury |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
New Case Filing
Date: June 30, 2021Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Motion For Appointment Of Special Process Server Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: June 30, 2021Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: August 27, 2021Alias Summons Issued
Date: September 08, 2021Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: No Contact
Date: July 23, 2021Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: August 27, 2021Exhibits Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: September 20, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.