Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gutierrez, Armando, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Olmsteadexec, D Rob, represented by Attorney Generals Office, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Moshe Jacobius presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoshe Jacobius Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Review |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Withdraw(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: April 26, 2022Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Answer/Response/Reply
Date: April 18, 2022Continuance - Allowed -
Date: April 21, 2022Exhibits Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: April 21, 2022Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Answer/Reply/Response - Allowed
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Clerk Status
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: April 21, 2022Clerk Status
Date: April 21, 2022Postcard Generated
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: April 26, 2022Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement
Date: April 21, 2022Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Case Mgmt Call Notice Mailed
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Case Electronically Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00298 Petition Filed - Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Waiver Filed
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference-Allowed
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Waiver Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Agreement to Participate in Remote Video Proceedings - Filed
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Administrative Review Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Waiver Filed
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Letter Returned Filed
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00298 Plaintiff/Petitioner- 100% - Granted/Allowed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00298 PETITION FILED - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00MOTION TO - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00WAIVER FILED
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00AGREEMENT TO PARTICIPATE IN REMOTE VIDEO PROCEEDINGS
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00298 PETITION PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER - 100% GRANTED/ALLOWED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE-ALLOWED
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.