Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
U.S. Bank National Associ, filed a(n) case represented by Codilis, Ernest J, against Waltman Patricia, Waltman Michael, Unknown Owners And Nonrec, United States Of America, Emc Mortgage Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Baysinger, Matthew Carl, United St Atty Crim, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Joel L. Chupack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoel L. Chupack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
Affidavit Of Compliance Filed
Date: October 07, 2021File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: October 12, 2021Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: October 12, 2021Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Answer To Complaint Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Affidavit Of Compliance Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice Of Hearing Filed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Waiver -
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Waiver Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Owner Occupied Single Family Home Or Condominium - Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE WAIVER -
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00WAIVER FILED
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: October 12, 2021CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED
Date: October 07, 2021CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED
Date: October 06, 2021STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: October 12, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.