Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Keisha Smith And All Comp, filed a(n) Injunction case represented by Pro Se, against Us Dept Of Justice, Sbaoig, Mccelland Mary K, Doj, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Alison C. Conlon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlison C. Conlon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryInjunction |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
298 Petition Filed - Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Dismissed For Want Of Prosecution
Date: November 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Injunction Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: September 22, 2021E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Notice Of Removal
Date: September 15, 2021E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: August 31, 2021Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Case Mgmt Call Notice Mailed
Date: October 01, 2021Miscellaneous Motion - Continued -
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00298 PETITION FILED - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00INJUNCTION COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.