Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Van Oak Capital Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Albany Bank & Trust Compa, City Of Chicago, Epifanio, Barban, represented by Soliz, Juan M, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with CLEARY, GERALD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCLEARY, GERALD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial, Mixed Commercial/Residential Or Industrial |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Answer Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Judgment Of Foreclosure Entered (Case Is Pending)
Date: October 02, 2023Motion Filed
Date: September 22, 2023Motion Filed
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: October 02, 2023Notice Filed
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Summary Judgment - Allowed -
Date: October 02, 2023Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: October 30, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Order To Appoint Selling Officer - Allowed
Date: October 02, 2023Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Answer/Reply/Response - Allowed
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Commercial, Mixed Commercial/Residential Or Industrial-Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Motion Filed
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: September 22, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-09-22T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: October 30, 2023Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2023-09-22T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: November 06, 2023Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Commercial, Mixed Commercial/Residential Or Industrial-Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00COMMERCIAL, MIXED COMMERCIAL/RESIDENTIAL OR INDUSTRIAL - FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.