Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chowdhury Sarbani, filed a(n) General Chancery case represented by Owens Law Llc, against Allstate Financial Servic, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Eve M. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEve M. Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryGeneral Chancery |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: July 13, 2021Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: July 13, 2021Case Set On Status Call
Date: November 10, 2021General Chancery Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Voluntary Dismissal, Non-Suit Or Dismissed By Agreement
Date: December 08, 2021Electronic Notice Sent
Date: October 01, 2021New Case Filing
Date: July 13, 2021Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: December 08, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: July 13, 2021GENERAL CHANCERY FILED
Date: July 13, 2021CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.