Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fifth Third Bank, Nationa, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Manley Deas Kochalski Llc, against Ruff, Henry, Ruff, Shelley, Unknown Owners And Non-Re, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with William B. Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam B. Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryVacant Residential Single-Family Home/Condo |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: January 24, 2022Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2022Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Motion Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Dismiss, Strike Or Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Allowed -
Date: November 15, 2021Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Notice Of Default Order Mailed - Fee Paid
Date: November 18, 2021Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Judgment Of Foreclosure Entered (Case Is Pending)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Appt. Selling Officer(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice Of Hearing Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Order To Appoint Selling Officer - Allowed
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Motion - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Dismiss Party(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Judg. Of Foreclosure & Sale(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Letter Returned Filed
Date: January 11, 2022New Case Filing
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Vacant Residential Single Family Home Or Condominium - Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00VACANT RESIDENTIAL SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.