Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tvc Mortgage Trust 2020-R, filed a(n) Vacant Residential - 6 Units Or Less case represented by 150 N Michigan#800, , Chicago Il, 60602, Kelly Kronenberg, against 4808 S. Prairie Llc, Gelfond Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with SIMKO DARRYL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSIMKO DARRYL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryVacant Residential - 6 Units Or Less |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
Affidavit Of Compliance Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Stipulation Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Compliance With Predatory Lending
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Vacant Residential (6 Units Or Less) - Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Alternative Service(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Affidavit Of Special Process Server
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Amend Order Or Decree - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Memorandum Of Judgement Entered
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Mortgage Forclosure Disposed / Sheriffs Sale Approved
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Order For Possession
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Citation To Discover Assets Issued
Date: 2023-06-01T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Order To Appoint Selling Officer - Allowed
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Citation To Discover Assets Issued
Date: 2023-06-01T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Dismiss, Strike Or Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Of Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Affidavit Of Compliance Filed
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Judgment Of Foreclosure Entered (Case Is Pending)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Receipt Filed
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Report Of Sale And Distribution
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Order Shortening Redemption Period - Allowed
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: October 17, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: October 17, 2023Continuance - Allowed -
Date: September 15, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: September 15, 2023Motion To Vacate, Modify/Reinstate Final Order/Judgment > 30 Days
Date: September 22, 2023Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: October 17, 2023Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: October 17, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: July 31, 2023Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-07-28T00:00:00Notice Of Hearing Filed
Date: September 05, 2023Affidavit Of Special Process Server
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-07-28T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: July 31, 2023Summons Not Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-07-28T00:00:00Summons Not Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-07-28T00:00:00Affidavit Of Special Process Server
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Affidavit Of Special Process Server
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00COMPLIANCE WITH PREDATORY LENDING
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00VACANT RESIDENTIAL (6 UNITS OR LESS) - FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.