Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund S, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by 1 North Dearborn #12, , Chicago Il, 60602, Mccalla Raymer Leibert Pi, against Owners And Non-Record Cla, Secretary Of Housing And, Springsteen Jennifer, Springsteen Kenneth, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Gerald V. Cleary, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald V. Cleary, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryOwner Occupied Single-Family Home/Condo |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Affidavit Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Summary Judgment - Allowed -
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Owner Occupied Single Family Home Or Condominium - Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Affidavit Of Special Process Server
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Waiver -
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Affidavit Of Compliance Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Waiver Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Report Of Sale And Distribution
Date: September 09, 2022Order For Possession
Date: September 28, 2022Order To Appoint Selling Officer - Allowed
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Receipt Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Affidavit Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Receipt Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Notice Of Filing Of Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Judgment Of Foreclosure Entered (Case Is Pending)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Dismiss, Strike Or Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Allowed -
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Mortgage Forclosure Disposed / Sheriffs Sale Approved
Date: September 28, 2022Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Order Shortening Redemption Period - Allowed
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00WAIVER FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE WAIVER -
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.