Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
Katelyn Wilcox, Wilcox Katelyn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Feinberg Sharma Pc, against Beermann Pritikin Mirabell, Curtis Wilcox, Wilcox Curtis, represented by Davis Friedman Zavett Etc, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Romanek, Abbey Fishman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRomanek, Abbey Fishman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 22, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00Mot/Pet For Temp/Allocation Of Parental Responsibilities
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00Rule To Show Cause Filed
Date: 2023-11-22T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: December 12, 2023Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2023-10-31T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2023-11-02T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: December 12, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Petitioner - Allowed -
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Respondent - Allowed -
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Petitioner - Allowed -
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00DR3530
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Inclement Weather, Chief Judge's Order
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Appoint Atty, Child Rep, Gal, Trustee Or Exec. - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Marriage
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Petition For Dissolution Of
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00DR3530
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Action Involves Minor Child/Children
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Parties Have Not Previously Filed For Divorce
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Certificate Of Dissolution Filed
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Case Electronically Filed
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Petition For Temp Child Support
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Emergency Notice Filed
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00DR3368
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Petition For Exclusive Possession
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Assign To Judge Within Division
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Place On Reconciliation Calendar - Allowed -
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Return For Random Assignment
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Re-Randomized / Old Case Added / Maintenance
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Assign To Judge Within Division
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00DR3530
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Disburse Monies Or Funds - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00DR3530
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Injunction - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Document Submitted via eFiling
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Cause Continued For Hearing (Agreed) - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00DR3118
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Qualified Domestic Relations Order - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Substitution And/Or Withdrawal Of Attorney Filed
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Injunction - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: 2021-04-10T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Amend Order Or Decree - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Memorandum Of Judgment Entered
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Memorandum Of Judgment Entered
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Confirmation Of Prior Order - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Parties Have Previously Filed A Parentage Petition
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Petition For Temp Protection Order
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Confirmation Of Prior Order - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Order Release/Satisfaction - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Amended Petition Filed
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00DR4801
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Petition For Order Of Protection Continued For Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: December 29, 2023Order Parenting Time To Respondent - Allowed -
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: December 29, 2023Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: December 29, 2023Comply - Allowed -
Date: March 05, 2024Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: March 05, 2024Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Petition For Order Of Protection Continued For Hearing - Allowed -
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Health Care Notice - Filed
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: 2021-02-06T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Respondent - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Petition For Issuance Of Rule (To Show Cause) Filed
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Case Off Call
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Action Involves Minor Child/Children
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: April 09, 2024Case Set On Progress Call
Date: March 05, 2024Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: April 09, 2024Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Petition For Temp Protection Order
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Emergency Order Of Protection - Continued
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Emergency Order Of Protection - Allowed
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Served In Open Court - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00OP - Exclusive Possession Of Residence To Respondent
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00DR3530
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Order Vacating Order Of Protection - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Petition For Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Petition For Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Order For Turnover Of Funds - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Order On Motion To Provide Medical Insurance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Order Support Payments Made Direct To Petitioner - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Discharge Atty, Child Rep, Gal, Trustee Or Exec. - Allowed
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Order Temporary Maintenance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Case Off Call
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Report Or Record Of Proceedings Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Confirmation Of Prior Order - Allowed -
Date: July 06, 2022Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Order Support Payments Direct To C.C.C./S.D.U. - Allowed -
Date: August 18, 2022Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: October 03, 2022Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: August 09, 2022Order Parenting Time To Respondent - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Petition For Independent Protection Order
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Child Support Data Sheet
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Appoint Atty, Child Rep, Gal, Trustee Or Exec. - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Child Representative
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2023-05-08T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2023-05-08T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-05-08T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Confirmation Of Prior Order - Allowed -
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Parenting Coordinator - Allowed
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Judgment For Defendant
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Amend Order Or Decree - Allowed -
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Held In Contempt Of Court - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Emergency Order Of Protection - Denied
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Restricted Image
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice To Produce Filed
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Petitioner - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Respondent - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Health Care Notice - Filed
Date: 2020-12-06T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Amend Order Or Decree - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: 2022-11-06T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Parties Have Previously Filed For Divorce
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Emergency Order Of Protection - Denied
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Document Submitted via eFiling
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Respondent - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Petition For Issuance Of Rule (To Show Cause) Filed
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Amend Order Or Decree - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Health Care Notice - Filed
Date: 2020-12-06T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: 2021-04-10T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: 2021-02-06T00:00:00Order Release/Satisfaction - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Amend Order Or Decree - Allowed -
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Health Care Notice - Filed
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Petitioner - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Respondent - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Petition For Temp Protection Order
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Restricted Image
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Emergency Order Of Protection - Denied
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Petition For Order Of Protection Continued For Hearing - Allowed -
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Answer To Petition Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Confirmation Of Prior Order - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Injunction - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Notice To Produce Filed
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Cause Continued For Hearing (Agreed) - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Amended Petition Filed
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00OP - Exclusive Possession Of Residence To Respondent
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Emergency Order Of Protection - Continued
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Emergency Order Of Protection - Allowed
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Petition For Temp Protection Order
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Respondent - Allowed -
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Inclement Weather, Chief Judge's Order
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Petitioner - Allowed -
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Assign To Judge Within Division
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Assign To Judge Within Division
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Place On Reconciliation Calendar - Allowed -
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Petition For Exclusive Possession
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Certificate Of Dissolution Filed
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Parties Have Not Previously Filed For Divorce
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Case Electronically Filed
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Action Involves Minor Child/Children
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Return For Random Assignment
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Emergency Notice Filed
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Petition For Relief Filed
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Petition For Temp Child Support
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Marriage
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Petition For Dissolution Of
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Memorandum Of Judgment Entered
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Memorandum Of Judgment Entered
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Judgment For Defendant
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Report Or Record Of Proceedings Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Order For Turnover Of Funds - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Order Temporary Maintenance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Order On Motion To Provide Medical Insurance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Discharge Atty, Child Rep, Gal, Trustee Or Exec. - Allowed
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Order Support Payments Made Direct To Petitioner - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Case Off Call
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Petition For Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Docket Correction
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Cause Continued For Hearing (Agreed) - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Petition For Order Of Protection Continued For Hearing - Allowed -
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Return For Random Assignment
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Emergency Order Of Protection - Continued
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Inclement Weather, Chief Judge's Order
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - DENIED
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00RESTRICTED IMAGE
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00PETITION FOR ORDER OF PROTECTION CONTINUED FOR HEARING - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00PETITION FOR TEMP PROTECTION ORDER
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00STRIKE FUTURE COURT DATE
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00STRIKE FUTURE COURT DATE
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00MOTION TO - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00ANSWER TO PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00CONFIRMATION OF PRIOR ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00INJUNCTION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00STRIKE FUTURE COURT DATE
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00NOTICE TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00AMENDED PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00DISBURSE MONIES OR FUNDS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00CAUSE CONTINUED FOR HEARING (AGREED) - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF JUDGMENT ENTERED
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF JUDGMENT ENTERED
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION AND/OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00ORDER ON MOTION TO PROVIDE MEDICAL INSURANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00ORDER FOR TURNOVER OF FUNDS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00ORDER SUPPORT PAYMENTS MADE DIRECT TO PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00ORDER TEMPORARY MAINTENANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00ORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00DISCHARGE ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00CASE OFF CALL
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00SERVED IN OPEN COURT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00ORDER VACATING ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00OP - EXCLUSIVE POSSESSION OF RESIDENCE TO RESPONDENT
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - CONTINUED
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00PETITION FOR TEMP PROTECTION ORDER
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00INCLEMENT WEATHER, CHIEF JUDGE'S ORDER
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00STRIKE FUTURE COURT DATE
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00STRIKE FUTURE COURT DATE
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00ORDER PARENTING TIME TO RESPONDENT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00ORDER PARENTING TIME TO PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00PLACE ON RECONCILIATION CALENDAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00PETITION FOR EXCLUSIVE POSSESSION
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00ACTION INVOLVES MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00RETURN FOR RANDOM ASSIGNMENT
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PETITION FOR TEMP CHILD SUPPORT
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00APPOINT ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00PETITION FOR RELIEF FILED
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00EMERGENCY NOTICE FILED
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00INJUNCTION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00MARRIAGE
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.