Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Financial Fsb, filed a(n) case represented by Crowley & Lamb Pc, against Unknown Owners, Troyanovski Alexander, Nonrecord Claimants, Mt Prospect Development, represented by Anderson Russal J, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with John C. Griffin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn C. Griffin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
SATISFACTION (OR RELEASE) OF JUDGMENT FILED
Date: November 27, 2013MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - ALLOWED -
Date: February 01, 2011MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: January 04, 2011NOTICE OF CHANGE OF OFFICE FILED
Date: October 07, 2011MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: September 24, 2010CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: November 02, 2010CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: December 22, 2010MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: November 17, 2010ORDER FOR POSSESSION
Date: 2010-09-08T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE DISPOSED / SHERIFFS SALE APPROVED
Date: 2010-09-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-08-25T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-08-25T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-07-08T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-07-08T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-08-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-08-25T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-20T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-03-03T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-11T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-03-03T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-02-10T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2010-02-10T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-03-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-03-03T00:00:00JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)
Date: 2010-02-10T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2010-02-08T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00***COMPEL DISCOVERY(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2009-12-09T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-10-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-10-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-10-07T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-11-19T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-11-23T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-10-02T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-10-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-10-02T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-10-02T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-08-31T00:00:00***MISC.MOTION(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-08-31T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-08-31T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-08-31T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-09-29T00:00:00ANSWER TO PETITION FILED
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00ORDER FOR POSSESSION
Date: 2009-06-10T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-08-27T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-01T00:00:00MEMORANDUM FILED
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-07-28T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-08-27T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-01T00:00:00EMERGENCY NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-08-27T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-06-10T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00***SUMMARY JUDGMENT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-08-27T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-20T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-05-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00***APPOINT RECEIVER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-05-13T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-16T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-05-06T00:00:00***SUMMARY JUDGMENT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-05-06T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-05-06T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN OWNERS FILED
Date: 2009-01-02T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2009-01-02T00:00:00COMMERCIAL, MIXED COMMERCIAL/RESIDENTIAL OR INDUSTRIAL - FILED
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-05-07T00:00:00***FILE APPEARANCE & PLEADING(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-16T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2009-05-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-04-13T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-20T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-05-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-05-13T00:00:00CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2009-04-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2009-01-02T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-04-16T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF JUDGEMENT ENTERED
Date: April 10, 2012CITATION TO DISCOVER ASSETS ISSUED
Date: September 24, 2010FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-20T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-10-02T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00***VACATE ORDER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2009-01-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.