Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
092209 Trans Law Div, Singh Amrik, Singh Jaslyn, filed a(n) Declaratory Judgement case represented by Engelberg Hillison, against Country Preferred Insuranc, Paluska Michael C, represented by Litchfield Cavo Llp, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with John C. Griffin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn C. Griffin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: September 02, 2011EXHIBITS FILED
Date: November 04, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: November 12, 2010ANSWER FILED
Date: September 23, 2011EXHIBITS FILED
Date: September 02, 2011NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: September 23, 2011REQUEST TO ADMIT FILED
Date: September 02, 2011MOTION FILED
Date: November 04, 2011EXHIBITS FILED
Date: November 12, 2010CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: November 12, 2010NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2010-09-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-09-14T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2010-09-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-09-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-07-09T00:00:00REQUEST FILED
Date: 2010-05-03T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-06-24T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00REQUEST TO ADMIT FILED
Date: 2010-05-03T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-05-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2010-05-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-04-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-04-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2010-04-08T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2010-04-08T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-01-06T00:00:00ORDER FOR POSSESSION
Date: 2010-02-03T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE DISPOSED / SHERIFFS SALE APPROVED
Date: 2010-02-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-01-06T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2010-01-06T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-11-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-11-24T00:00:00TRANSFERRED TO PRESIDING JUDGE
Date: 2009-09-22T00:00:00DISMISS ENTIRE CAUSE - DEFENDANT -
Date: 2009-09-22T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-11-24T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - ALW -
Date: 2009-09-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-11-24T00:00:00TRANSFER TO PRESIDING JUDGE FOR TRANS TO OUT OF THE DIVISION
Date: 2009-09-22T00:00:00TRANSFER TO OTHER DIVISION - WITHIN COOK COUNTY -
Date: 2009-09-22T00:00:00CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-02-24T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - DND -
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-06-23T00:00:00***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-03-26T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-14T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-07-17T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-07T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-26T00:00:00CHANGE OF VENUE - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2009-06-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2009-02-24T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-07T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2009-08-06T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-08-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-06-23T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-03T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - ALW -
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-03-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-06T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-06-23T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2009-02-20T00:00:00***SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00***TRANSFER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATORY JUDGMENT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2010-10-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2010-07-22T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-07-22T00:00:00REQUEST FILED
Date: 2010-07-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-07-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-06-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-06-23T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2010-07-09T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-01-25T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2009-04-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.