Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Home Finance, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Unknown Owners, Twelve Oaks Schaumburg Co, Nonrecord Claimants, Lares Catalina, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with John C. Griffin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn C. Griffin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: February 08, 2010STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-08-13T00:00:00RECEIPT FILED
Date: February 23, 2010ORDER FOR POSSESSION
Date: February 23, 2010NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: February 08, 2010MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: January 14, 2010AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2009-09-18T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-12-04T00:00:00REPORT OF SALE AND DISTRIBUTION
Date: February 23, 2010NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-12-04T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-09-18T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE DISPOSED / SHERIFFS SALE APPROVED
Date: February 23, 2010***APPROVE SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: January 14, 2010MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-01-14T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2009-04-28T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN OWNERS FILED
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: February 23, 2010SHERIFF'S RETURN OF EVICTION CANCELLED
Date: September 21, 2012JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)
Date: 2009-09-18T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-09-18T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-09-18T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.