Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bahamondes, Alexander Paul, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Kreitner, Keri Lyn, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time62 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Destruction of Exhibits | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | No Longer Under Submission | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Matter Taken Under Submission Matter under submission: Judgment Judicial officer: Jakubowski |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Decision Sheet | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Referred to Small Claims Mediation Program | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 02/26/2018 Small Claims Hearing Judge: Jakubowski, Susan |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER Costs: 65.00Hearing Date: 02/26/18 Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER Costs: 65.00 Hearing Date: 02/26/18 |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.