Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of San Mateo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Child Support Services, against Barron Arechiga, Marco Antonio, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time40 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS & JUDGMENT FILED 2-5-2018 |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Judgment or Supplemental Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations and Judgment |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation sent for signature to Judicial Officer 32, STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents Proof of Service |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint regarding Parental Obligations Summons and Complaint |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.