Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of San Mateo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Child Support Services, against Moran Melgar, Oscar Alexander, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with McKenna, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcKenna, Kathleen Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents Proof of Service |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial JUDGMENT, CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, AND OTHER: ONE0HALF OF UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL AND DENTAL EXPENSES Judge: McKenna, Kathleen |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order or Judgment (ORDER) |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents Proof of Service |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion re: JUDGMENT, CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, AND OTHER: ONE-HALF UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL AND DENTAL EXPENSES |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Reporter service less than one hour | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint or Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations & ETC. |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.