Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvny Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brodbeck, Lori, against Bartolo, Edgar, Does 1 To 5, Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time198 days |
Complaint
Date: December 27, 2017Request For Dismissal
Date: July 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Non-Service SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CAUSE OF ACTION, DECLARATI Declaration of Non-Service SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CAUSE OF ACTION, DECLARATION OF JURISDICTIONAL FACTS, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, DOD STATUS REPORT |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF NON-MILITARY STATUS Declaration OF NON-MILITARY STATUS |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.