Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pmgi Financial, Llc, A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian, John P, against Does 1-5, Robles, Fernando S., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time114 days |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: September 11, 2018Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment
Date: April 12, 2018Complaint
Date: December 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: ORANGEStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 06/06/18Amount: 3125.11 Writ of Execution Return County: ORANGE Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 06/06/18 Amount: 3125.11 |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $198.00 Credit: 0 Interest: $107.37 |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $29.44 |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of ORANGE Issued On: 06/06/18 Amount: $3125.11 |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued Amount: $3070.67 |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support OF OWNERSHIP AND CHAIN OF TITLE FROM LOANME TO PMGI FINANCIAL, LLC. Declaration in Support OF OWNERSHIP AND CHAIN OF TITLE FROM LOANME TO PMGI FINANCIAL, LLC. |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 ; ORIGINAL CREDITOR Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 ; ORIGINAL CREDITOR'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT. |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration Supporting Attorney Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.